MA S1409 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to corrections officers injured in the line of duty. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to corrections officers injured in the line of duty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-25SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-10-26JointHearing rescheduled to 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-10-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1129 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1131 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S943 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1314 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1743 (Similar To) 2015-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1338 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1410 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H2301 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback