OH HB214 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Referred to committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Referred to committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3314.03 and 3326.11 and to enact section 3319.614 of the Revised Code to require each public school to adopt a policy regarding certain expectations related to the performance of staff member professional duties and to amend the version of section 3314.03 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect January 1, 2025, to continue the changes on and after that effective date.
Title
Regards public school staff member professional duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | Senate | Referred to committee: Education |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | House | Passed |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-06-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 614 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |