MA S832 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt dog training areas from civil or criminal action relating to noise pollution. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to dog training areas in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2204 |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 and A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S781 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S580 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H966
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1439 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2158
S719 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S652 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S781 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S580 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied H966
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1439 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2158
S719 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S652 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S832 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S832.pdf |