MA S891 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-08-05 - Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent COVID-19 evictions and foreclosures and promote an equitable housing recovery.. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent COVID-19 evictions and foreclosures and promote an equitable housing recovery.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-05JointHearing scheduled for 08/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Reported in part, S2475
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
H1434 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4121 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Adopted - 131 YEAS to 28 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 103 )
S2401 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1897 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H139 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1194 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2021 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
H494 (Similar To) 2021-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S250 (Similar To) 2021-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4234 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Committee on conference appointed (Rodrigues-Friedman-O'Connor), in concurrence
S2079 (Similar To) 2021-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2289 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1193 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2021 from 10:30 AM-02:30 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback