MA S515 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to secure choice retirement savings plan. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to secure choice retirement savings plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2408 |
2018-01-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1667 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2408 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2272 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2408 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4967 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 379 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S515.pdf |