MA S280 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure that public schools appropriately educate advanced students and gifted and talented children. Education.
Title
To ensure that public schools appropriately educate advanced students and gifted and talented children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S279 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S280.pdf |