MA S279 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to an expert panel on gifted children and their education. Education.
Title
Relative to an expert panel on gifted children and their education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S280 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H540 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H540 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S279 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S279.pdf |