MA S2565 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S175
Note: Replaces legislation S182
Note: Replaces legislation S185
Note: Replaces legislation S2273

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to regulate online gaming, daily fantasy sports, and online sports betting, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2565).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to economic development issues

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-12SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2018-06-19SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2018-06-19SenateAccompanied by S175, S182, S185 and S2273
2018-06-19SenateReported from the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S175 (Replaces) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S182 (Replaces) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S185 (Replaces) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2273 (Replaces) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1368 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S609 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1413 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S276 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2258
S403 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback