MA S182 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2565

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to online lottery. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to online lottery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2565
2018-05-31HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2018-05-31SenateReporting date extended to Friday, June 15, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-05-31SenateAmendment adopted
2018-05-31SenateRules suspended
2018-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Thursday, May 31, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S952 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S168 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S139 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H203 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H686 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H142 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1996 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H135 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
H26 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H27 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4329
S2565 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback