MA H1996 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the distribution of lottery funds to cities and towns in direct proportion to the total revenues accruing from lottery sales in each such municipality. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the distribution of revenues accruing from the sale of lottery tickets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4638 |
2017-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H4638 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1996 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1996.pdf |