MA S175 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2565

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to horse racing and wagering. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to horse racing and wagering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2565
2018-05-31HouseAdopted, in concurrence
2018-05-31SenateReporting date extended to Friday, June 15, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-05-31SenateAmendment adopted
2018-05-31SenateRules suspended
2018-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Thursday, May 31, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S2565 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback