MA S2501 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-24 - Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to vocational education transportation for nonresident students (Senate, No. 2331),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “Resolve establishing a special commission on vocational education transportation” (Senate, No. 2501).
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission on vocational education transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Read; and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2331 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2331 |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2353 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2016
S2308 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2389
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
H3167 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S288 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S1863 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H297 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1597 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2308 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2389
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1878 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1851 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
H3167 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S288 (Similar To) 2016-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2331
S1863 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H297 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S1597 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
S1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2501 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2501.pdf |