MA H297 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to coordinating the availability of transit services to employees of existing and expanding businesses by the Massachusetts Office of Business Development. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to transit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H321 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H297.pdf |