MA S2498 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to exempt Marcel Cuffy and John R. Baker from the maximum age requirements for firefighters in the town of North Andover. Public Service. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempting Marcel Cuffy and John R. Baker from the maximum age requirements for firefighters in the town of North Andover

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2021-08-25JointHearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-22HouseHouse concurred
2021-07-21SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S44 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3529 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
S2398 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1704 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1330 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
H2674 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2676 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3630 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
H2592 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2943 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S1697 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1698 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback