MA H2592 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to employees of the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority under the retirement law for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Chapter 32 of the Massachusetts General Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3529 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1704 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2653
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Sunday July 31, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
H2674 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
H2676 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3630 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1747 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1739 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
S1786 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1734 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2021

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback