MA S1786 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safety of fire, police, and emergency medical technicians from contagious diseases. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the safety of fire, police, and emergency medical technicians from contagious diseases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2679 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1640 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2652 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S1748 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H4838 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2022
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4296
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S1771 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1640 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2652 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S1748 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S2166 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H4838 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2022
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1786 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1786.pdf |