MA S2166 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure gas safety and consumer fairness. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to ensuring gas safety and consumer fairness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2712 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1589 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1709 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2176 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2712 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1589 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1709 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2176 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1651 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2672
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2166.pdf |