MA S2436 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Public Safety and Transparency by Transportation Network Companies.
Title
Relative to public safety and transparency by transportation network companies
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 20, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 6, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 11, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | House concurred |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2712 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1709 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1621 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2712 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1582 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1586 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1709 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2436.pdf |