MA S2205 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H3280 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3281 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5053
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5053 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3281 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5053
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5053 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2205 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2205.pdf |