MA S34 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2479
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow the city of Gloucester to appoint retired police officers as special police officers. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
To allow the city of Gloucester to appoint retired police officers as special police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2479 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Amended (Tarr) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/20/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-22 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2479 (Replaces) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H2765 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H620 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3971 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4838
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H537 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H2765 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H620 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H3911 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2491 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - New draft substituted, see S2588
H3971 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4838
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H537 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2876 (Similar To) 2022-12-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2022
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S34 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S34.pdf |