MA H2786 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to Group 4 retirement benefits for police officers working on Massachusetts public higher education campuses. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a fair and equitable group 4 retirement benefit for police officers working on Massachusetts public higher education campuses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2479 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2021
S34 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Reprinted as amended, see S2479
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H2765 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1744 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3911 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3971 (Similar To) 2021-08-25 - Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1773 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S1610 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1750 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1618 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2611 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2553 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1690 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2398 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2589 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1707 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1739 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1711 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback