MA S1711 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize a local option for group retirement classification. Public Service.
Title
To authorize a local option for group retirement classification
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2679 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H2852 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3039 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2852 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3039 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2549 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2588 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1711 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1711.pdf |