MA H2549 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to cost of living adjustments for retired public employees of the Commonwealth. Public Service.
Title
Relative to cost of living adjustments for retired public employees of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2787 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2549.pdf |