MA H3039 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Pignatelli of Lenox and Vitolo of Brookline, a petition of Smitty Pignatelli, Tommy Vitolo and others that cities and towns be authorized to establish an excise tax on gasoline. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a local option gas tax
Sponsors
Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] |
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H825 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1955 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2957 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H2852 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S244 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2152 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1955 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2957 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5200
H2852 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S890 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S244 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2152 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3039 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3039.pdf |