MA H3630 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a red shield/blue shield license plate to survivors of firefighters and police officers who died in the line of duty. Transportation.
Title
Providing for a Red Shield/Blue Shield license plate to survivors of firefighters and police officers who have died in the line of duty
Sponsors
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3484 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2674 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2676 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3494 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Accompanied H3477
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2376 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2333 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3486 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3488 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2674 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2676 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3494 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Accompanied H3477
S2319 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2376 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2333 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3630 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3630.pdf |