MA S1330 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2190
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2008. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
To repeal Chapter 404 of the Acts of 2008
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | House | Accompanied H2190 |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1433 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H2190 (Replaced by) 2022-02-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2022
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4087 (Similar To) 2022-01-03 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4315
H4315 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2022
S2962 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H2190 (Replaced by) 2022-02-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 20 of the Acts of 2022
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2498 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
H4087 (Similar To) 2022-01-03 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4315
H4315 (Similar To) 2022-03-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2022
S2962 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1330 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1330.pdf |