MA S1433 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the state menthol ban. Public Health.
Title
To repeal the state menthol ban
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2406 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1330 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
S991 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1330 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Accompanied H2190
S1862 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S930 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2956
S1596 (Similar To) 2022-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 236 of the Acts of 2022
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
S991 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1433 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1433.pdf |