MA S2389 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure a free and open internet in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure a free and open internet in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02JointHearing scheduled for 04/03/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2018-04-02HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2018-03-29SenateRules suspended
2018-03-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4151 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2062 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H3698 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2053 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
S179 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2485
H3331 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2254 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback