NY S06707 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-08 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that being eighteen years old or more, while in the course of committing rape in the first, second or third degree, criminal sexual act in the first, second or third degree, sexual abuse in the first degree, aggravated sexual abuse in the first, second, third or fourth degree, or incest in the first, second or third degree, against a person less than eighteen years old, he or she intentionally causes the death of such person.
Title
Provides that being eighteen years old or more, while in the course of committing rape in the first, second or third degree, criminal sexual act in the first, second or third degree, sexual abuse in the first degree, aggravated sexual abuse in the first, second, third or fourth degree, or incest in the first, second or third degree, against a person less than eighteen years old, he or she intentionally causes the death of such person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-03-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04661 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes