MA S2172 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to COLA adjustments for veteran benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to COLA adjustments for veteran benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2089 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2151 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2154 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2151 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2154 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2172 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2172.pdf |