MA S2151 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Veterans' Education Tuition System (VETS). Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to Veterans' Education Tuition System (VETS)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H3241 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1225 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H481 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H3241 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1225 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2151 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2151.pdf |