MA H481 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a fund to be known as the education fund. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To fund a more affordable public higher education system in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseHouse concurred
2020-11-19SenateAmendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence
2020-11-19SenateReporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-18HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred
2019-04-16HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Higher Education
2019-04-01JointHearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H1214 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - House concurred
H1216 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - House concurred
H1227 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H2234 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2233 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2322 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S292 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S308 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S751 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback