MA H2322 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include certain faculty employed at public institutions of higher education in the retirement system for public employees. Public Service.
Title
To ensure fair public higher education workplaces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S748 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S1547 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
S1547 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2322 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2322.pdf |