MA S748 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2541
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2541 |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1500 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3430 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3298 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1522 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2122 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1597 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4076 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2316 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3430 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3298 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1522 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H1374 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2122 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1479 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1597 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2342 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4076 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2541 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S748 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S748.pdf |