MA H1214 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide adequate funding for the Commonwealth’s public institutions of higher education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committing to higher education the resources to insure a strong and healthy public higher education system

Sponsors

Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]
Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Sen. James Welch [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]
Rep. Michael Day [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Theodore Speliotis [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H481 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Senate concurred
S292 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S282 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback