MA H1313 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exclude certain veterans’ benefits in calculating housing assistance benefits. Housing.
Title
Relative to public housing determination for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4943 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1320 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3241 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4943 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3207 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3241 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4943 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1313 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1313.pdf |