MA S791 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2527

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a task force on the safety and welfare of elderly and disabled persons residing in public housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a task force on elderly and disabled persons residing in public housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2527
2019-04-24JointHearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
2019-04-16JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S1141 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1912 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1325 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1832 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2690 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Order reported favorably by committee on referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback