MA S2116 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an executive office of food resources and security. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing the Executive Office of Food Resources and Security
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D] | Rep. Christina Minicucci [D] |
Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3144 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2050 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S7 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Placed on file
S13 (Similar To) 2021-02-08 - See S9
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2116 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2116.pdf |