MA S1967 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to natural gas safety and responsibility. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to natural gas safety and responsibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2022 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S519 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1513 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2098 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2121 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2878 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H255 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Senate concurred
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2433 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback