MA H255 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 11:00 am in B-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to further regulating natural gas pipelines. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating of pipelines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2019-10-21SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-17HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1503 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H1663 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1378 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2000 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1965 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4001 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Leicester Public Library
H4183 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback