MA S2000 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to pipeline siting. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to pipeline siting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2847 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H784 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1832 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2879 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H784 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1832 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
S1963 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2879 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2001 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2000 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2000.pdf |