MA S1963 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation ensure safety and transparency in pipeline repair. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure safety and transparency in pipeline repair

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2022 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H821 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2098 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
H2627 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2121 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Recommended new draft for S610
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback