MA S1542 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2971
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the public safety building authority. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Creating the public safety building authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2971 |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H513 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1978 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3220 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1217 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2457 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2008 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1337 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Accompanied H2135
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2125 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H3138 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3099 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4856
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H513 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1978 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3220 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2178 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
H1942 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1217 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2457 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2008 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1337 (Similar To) 2021-12-09 - Accompanied H2135
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3821 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2125 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1542 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1542.pdf |