MA H3821 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2971
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating a municipal and public safety building authority. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Creating a municipal and public safety building authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2971 |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/26/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2021-05-27 | House | Returned from the Secretary of State |
2021-05-20 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Same As/Similar To
S2457 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H548 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1071 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S851 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H2737 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S683 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S354 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H548 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
S1071 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2519 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S851 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
H2737 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S683 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S354 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2727
H4902 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Governor's amendment adopted
S2971 (Replaced by) 2022-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3821 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3821.pdf |