MA S1217 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transparency in employee benefits reporting in private construction. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to transparency in employee benefits reporting in private construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1970 |
2021-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1970 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1217
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1720 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S967 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1217.pdf |