MA S2178 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2715
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safety and protection of utility work and construction sites. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the safety and protection of utility work and construction sites
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2715 |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3924 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Adopted
S2515 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4117 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2715 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1601 (Similar To) 2022-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2971
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2178 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2178.pdf |