MA S1402 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2020 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure the safety of our communities and citizens. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring the safety of our communities and citizens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-12JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/2020 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-11-30JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-11-01JointHearing scheduled for 12/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2022 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S95 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S519 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2098 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2121 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2505 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2433 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback