MA S1353 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1226 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S367 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S1497 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S941 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1226 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1289 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2469
S367 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S1497 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1187 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S941 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1353.pdf |