MA S1300 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2919
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure delivery of mental health services to adults with acute mental illness. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Resolve to ensure delivery of mental health services to adults with acute mental illness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2919 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2919 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2329 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
H4328 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2919 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2329 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
H4328 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1300.pdf |