MA H2329 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4328
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improvements to the local and regional public health systems to address disparities in the delivery of public health services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to accelerating improvements to the local and regional public health system to address disparities in the delivery of public health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4328 |
2021-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2586 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1872 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1745 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
H4328 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1461 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S806 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2586 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1872 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1745 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1203 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
H4328 (Replaced by) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5104
H5104 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5179 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - See H5104
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2329 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2329.pdf |